Assembly | 11/11/2024 | signed chap.445 | ||
Assembly | 11/08/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1639 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5195B | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.127 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.693 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | rules report cal.693 | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2023 | print number 4611b | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | print number 4611a | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to veterans' affairs | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2023 | referred to veterans' affairs |