Assembly | 06/05/2024 | substituted by s2413c | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | rules report cal.434 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | print number 4613c | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | amend and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | print number 4613b | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | print number 4613a | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | amend and recommit to veterans' affairs | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2023 | referred to veterans' affairs |