Assembly | 12/13/2024 | signed chap.556 | ||
Assembly | 12/02/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1024 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5159A | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | REFERRED TO CITIES 2 | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.130 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 04/17/2023 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.111 | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/06/2023 | print number 4674a | ||
Assembly | 03/06/2023 | amend and recommit to real property taxation | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2023 | referred to real property taxation |