Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.131 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | amended on third reading 4717b | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.227 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | rules report cal.227 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | print number 4717a | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to consumer affairs and protection | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2023 | referred to consumer affairs and protection |