Assembly | 12/08/2023 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 12/08/2023 | vetoed memo.85 | ||
Assembly | 11/29/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1198 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5664 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.228 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | rules report cal.228 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2023 | referred to governmental operations |