Assembly | 12/21/2024 | approval memo.55 | ||
Assembly | 12/21/2024 | signed chap.614 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1191 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4061A | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2024 | amended on third reading 4763a | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.133 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.91 | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2023 | referred to correction |