Assembly | 09/29/2023 | signed chap.508 | ||
Assembly | 09/19/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1811 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6027 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | repassed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | restored to third reading | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | amend by restoring to original print 4793 | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | amended on third reading (t) 4793a | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | recalled from senate | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.206 | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2023 | reported referred to ways and means |