Assembly | 11/17/2023 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 11/17/2023 | vetoed memo.49 | ||
Assembly | 11/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1755 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6303A | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.448 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | rules report cal.448 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2023 | amend and recommit to rules 4796a | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2023 | referred to consumer affairs and protection |