Assembly | 11/17/2023 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 11/17/2023 | vetoed memo.50 | ||
Assembly | 11/14/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1360 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S520A | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.154 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | rules report cal.154 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2023 | print number 4847a | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2023 | amend and recommit to local governments | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2023 | referred to local governments |