Assembly | 07/03/2024 | signed chap.60 | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1132 | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5423 | ||
Senate | 05/06/2024 | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.423 | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |