Assembly | 06/04/2024 | print number 4866d | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | amend and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to energy | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | print number 4866c | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | amend and recommit to energy | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2023 | print number 4866b | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2023 | print number 4866a | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to energy |