LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
A04867
Action History
NY
New York Assembly Bill A04867
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Assembly Bill A04867
Action History
Assembly
01/03/2024
referred to ways and means
Assembly
10/20/2023
print number 4867a
Assembly
10/20/2023
amend and recommit to ways and means
Assembly
05/31/2023
reported referred to ways and means
Assembly
05/23/2023
reported referred to codes
Assembly
02/24/2023
referred to judiciary