Assembly | 08/30/2024 | signed chap.295 | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1358 | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4262B | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.153 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | rules report cal.153 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2024 | print number 4914b | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2024 | amend and recommit to transportation | ||
Assembly | 03/06/2023 | print number 4914a |