Assembly | 06/05/2024 | substituted by s4598d | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | rules report cal.435 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | amend and recommit to rules 4917d | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2024 | print number 4917c | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2024 | amend (t) and recommit to education | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2024 | print number 4917b | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2024 | print number 4917a | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2024 | amend and recommit to education | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to education |