Assembly | 12/21/2024 | approval memo.94 | ||
Assembly | 12/21/2024 | signed chap.671 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.941 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5107C | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.424 | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2024 | print number 4921c | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2024 | amend and recommit to judiciary | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2024 | print number 4921b | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | print number 4921a | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to rules |