Assembly | 11/11/2024 | signed chap.446 | ||
Assembly | 11/08/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.462 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5937B | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.436 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | rules report cal.436 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2024 | print number 4924b | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2024 | amend and recommit to transportation | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to transportation | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | print number 4924a |