Assembly | 03/05/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.137 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/10/2023 | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1189 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6827 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.345 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | rules report cal.345 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to rules |