Assembly | 07/28/2023 | signed chap.217 | ||
Assembly | 07/21/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.890 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2199A | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | HOME RULE REQUEST | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.208 | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2023 | print number 4946a | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2023 | amend and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2023 | referred to ways and means |