Assembly | 06/30/2023 | signed chap.147 | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.845 | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3252A | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | REFERRED TO CITIES 1 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.233 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | rules report cal.233 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | amend and recommit to rules 4972a | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2023 | referred to real property taxation |