Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted by s9605 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | rules report cal.595 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/04/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | print number 4974b | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2024 | amend and recommit to real property taxation | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to real property taxation | ||
Assembly | 09/06/2023 | print number 4974a |