Assembly | 06/03/2024 | substituted by s158e | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | rules report cal.310 | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | amend and recommit to rules 4983d | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2024 | print number 4983c | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2024 | amend and recommit to science and technology | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to science and technology | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | print number 4983b | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | print number 4983a | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to science and technology |