Assembly | 10/25/2023 | signed chap.550 | ||
Assembly | 10/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.479 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4354A | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.502 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | rules report cal.502 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | amend and recommit to rules 4984b | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2023 | print number 4984a | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to insurance | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2023 | referred to insurance |