Assembly | 06/10/2023 | substituted by s5327a | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.503 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | rules report cal.503 | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2023 | print number 4986a | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2023 | amend and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2023 | referred to children and families |