Assembly | 07/28/2023 | signed chap.219 | ||
Assembly | 07/21/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.906 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4975A | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | HOME RULE REQUEST | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.198 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | rules report cal.198 | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2023 | print number 5008a | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2023 | amend and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2023 | referred to ways and means |