Assembly | 05/29/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | REFERRED TO CODES | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.154 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | rules report cal.154 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/14/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2024 | print number 5014a | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2024 | amend and recommit to codes | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | committed to codes | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.140 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.235 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | rules report cal.235 |