Senate | 05/20/2024 | RECOMMITTED TO BANKS | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2024 | repassed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | amended on third reading (t) 5019a | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | recalled from senate | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2024 | referred to banks | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.226 | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | reported |