Assembly | 11/17/2023 | approval memo.25 | ||
Assembly | 11/17/2023 | signed chap.640 | ||
Assembly | 11/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.323 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S809A | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.67 | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2023 | print number 5022a | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to tourism, parks, arts and sports development | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2023 | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |