Assembly | 07/28/2023 | signed chap.220 | ||
Assembly | 07/21/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1210 | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4069 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.574 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | rules report cal.574 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2023 | referred to libraries and education technology |