Assembly | 10/25/2023 | signed chap.552 | ||
Assembly | 10/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.846 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6225 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | HOME RULE REQUEST | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.575 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | rules report cal.575 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2023 | referred to real property taxation |