Assembly | 11/17/2023 | signed chap.641 | ||
Assembly | 11/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1403 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6940 | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.158 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | rules report cal.158 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2023 | referred to local governments |