Assembly | 03/31/2023 | signed chap.120 | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.571 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5818A | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.115 | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2023 | rules report cal.115 | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | print number 5057b | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | amend and recommit to election law | ||
Assembly | 03/06/2023 | print number 5057a | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2023 | referred to election law |