Assembly | 12/13/2024 | approval memo.28 | ||
Assembly | 12/13/2024 | signed chap.557 | ||
Assembly | 12/02/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.943 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7125A | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2024 | amended on third reading 5073a | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.142 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.93 | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2023 | reported |