Assembly | 11/17/2023 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 11/17/2023 | vetoed memo.53 | ||
Assembly | 11/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1041 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5332 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE USE DISORDERS | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/16/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.68 | ||
Assembly | 03/15/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2023 | referred to codes |