Assembly | 05/31/2023 | substituted by s4266a | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.349 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | rules report cal.349 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2023 | print number 5088a | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2023 | amend and recommit to governmental operations | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2023 | referred to governmental operations |