Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted by s4289a | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | rules report cal.596 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | home rule request | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.351 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | rules report cal.351 | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2023 | print number 5167a | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2023 | amend and recommit to ways and means |