Assembly | 06/01/2023 | substituted by s1733a | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | rules report cal.450 | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | print number 5180a | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to education | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2023 | referred to education |