Assembly | 07/22/2024 | enacting clause stricken | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2024 | print number 5214b | ||
Assembly | 02/01/2024 | amend and recommit to codes | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | print number 5214a | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2023 | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |