Assembly | 09/11/2023 | signed chap.360 | ||
Assembly | 09/07/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.693 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5362C | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.576 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | rules report cal.576 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | print number 5223c | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | amend and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | print number 5223b | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to transportation | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2023 | print number 5223a | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2023 | referred to transportation |