Assembly | 11/10/2023 | signed chap.614 | ||
Assembly | 11/09/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1488 | ||
Senate | 06/09/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4900A | ||
Senate | 06/07/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.627 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | rules report cal.627 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | print number 5261a | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2023 | amend and recommit to transportation | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2023 | referred to transportation |