Assembly | 09/27/2024 | signed chap.341 | ||
Assembly | 09/20/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1567 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5019B | ||
Senate | 05/29/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.155 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | rules report cal.155 | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2024 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | print number 5265a | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2024 | amend and recommit to real property taxation | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to real property taxation |