Assembly | 06/21/2023 | substituted by s5056a | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | rules report cal.867 | ||
Assembly | 06/21/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/09/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/08/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2023 | print number 5286a | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2023 | amend and recommit to codes | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2023 | referred to banks |