Assembly | 12/21/2024 | signed chap.615 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.395 | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1059 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.347 | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to governmental operations |