Assembly | 12/13/2024 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 12/13/2024 | vetoed memo.76 | ||
Assembly | 12/02/2024 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | 3RD READING CAL.1475 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5732 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.145 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.246 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | rules report cal.246 | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2023 | referred to health |