Senate | 06/07/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.598 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | rules report cal.598 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2024 | committed to codes | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | ordered to third reading cal.146 | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | DIED IN SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | REFERRED TO CODES | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.355 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | rules report cal.355 |