Assembly | 12/22/2023 | tabled | ||
Assembly | 12/22/2023 | vetoed memo.124 | ||
Assembly | 12/12/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1644 | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5781A | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | RECOMMITTED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/22/2023 | repassed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | amended on third reading 5477a | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2023 | recalled from senate | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.162 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | rules report cal.162 | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2023 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/10/2023 | referred to real property taxation |