Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted by s9262 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.526 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | rules report cal.526 | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2024 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2024 | print number 5564b | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2024 | amend and recommit to transportation | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to transportation | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | print number 5564a | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |