Assembly | 12/08/2023 | approval memo.38 | ||
Assembly | 12/08/2023 | signed chap.686 | ||
Assembly | 11/29/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.730 | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5397 | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.97 | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | reported |