Assembly | 10/25/2023 | signed chap.558 | ||
Assembly | 10/13/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.663 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5823C | ||
Senate | 06/01/2023 | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2023 | amended on third reading 5610d | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2023 | amended on third reading 5610c | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2023 | advanced to third reading cal.174 | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2023 | print number 5610b | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2023 | amend and recommit to codes | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2023 | print number 5610a | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2023 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2023 | referred to consumer affairs and protection |