Senate | 03/25/2024 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2024 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2024 | advanced to third reading cal.370 | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2024 | reported | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2024 | print number 5613b | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2024 | amend and recommit to governmental operations | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2024 | print number 5613a | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2024 | referred to governmental operations |