Assembly | 11/10/2023 | signed chap.615 | ||
Assembly | 11/09/2023 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | 3RD READING CAL.1173 | ||
Senate | 06/08/2023 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5834 | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2023 | passed assembly | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | ordered to third reading rules cal.360 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | rules report cal.360 | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2023 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2023 | reported referred to ways and means |